Global Patent Index - EP 1319467 A1

EP 1319467 A1 2003-06-18 - Honing tool comprising a deburring tool

Title (en)

Honing tool comprising a deburring tool

Title (de)

Honwerkzeug mit einem Entgratwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de rodage comprenant un outil d'ébarbage

Publication

EP 1319467 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027174 A

Priority

DE 20120294 U

Abstract (en)

A tool shaft (9) transmits a rotational movement and an oscillating movement in an axial direction of a bore to be machined with the tool. A deburring tool (3) is arranged on the tool shaft at an axial spacing to a honing tool (2) in a direction of the longitudinal axis of the tool shaft.

Abstract (de)

Ein Werkzeug zur Bearbeitung einer Bohrung umfaßt ein Honwerkzeug (2). Das Werkzeug weist einen Werkzeugschaft (9) auf, über den eine Drehbewegung und eine in Richtung der Bohrungsachse (5) oszillierende Bewegung übertragen werden können. Um das Honen und Entgraten einer Bohrung schnell, einfach und kostengünstig durchführen zu können, ist vorgesehen, daß an dem Werkzeugschaft (9) bezogen auf die Richtung der Bohrungsachse (5) in einem axialen Abstand zum Honwerkzeug (2) ein Entgratwerkzeug (3) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 33/08; B24B 9/00; B24B 33/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/00 (2006.01); B24B 33/08 (2006.01); B24B 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/10 (2013.01); B24B 9/00 (2013.01); B24B 33/08 (2013.01); Y10T 408/353 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120294 U1 20030424; DE 50212381 D1 20080731; EP 1319467 A1 20030618; EP 1319467 B1 20080618; US 2003114089 A1 20030619; US 7074116 B2 20060711

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212381

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101205

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101205

2010-08-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100708 AND 20100714

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080618

2009-05-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090319

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212381 P 20080731

2008-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060711

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO