Global Patent Index - EP 1319477 A1

EP 1319477 A1 2003-06-18 - Electrical hand tool with axial percussion

Title (en)

Electrical hand tool with axial percussion

Title (de)

Axial schlagendes Elektrohandwerkzeuggerät

Title (fr)

Outil portatif électrique à percussion axiale

Publication

EP 1319477 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02406048 A

Priority

DE 10160864 A

Abstract (en)

The power sensor (6'') has hydraulic fluid between two plates (7a,7b) connected by tubing (14) to cushion elements (6,6',6''') in the hand held grip parts (8,13) of the tool.

Abstract (de)

Ein Elektrohandwerkzeuggerät (1) zur zumindest teilweise axial schlagenden Bearbeitung eines Werkstücks mit einem Schlagwerk (2), mit einem Handgriff (4) und mit einem elektronischen Steuermittel (5) für zumindest einen Leistungsparameter des Elektrohandwerkzeuggerätes, wobei ein flächiger Kraftsensor (6", 6"') zwischen zumindest zwei, zumindest teilweise quer zur Schlagachse (A) orientierten, einander zugeordneten Pressflächen (7a, 7b) zur gleitbewegungsfreien Erfassung der vom Nutzer in Richtung auf das Werkstück ausgeübten Anpresskraft (F, F') angeordnet ist und dass das Steuermittel (5) mit dem Kraftsensor (6", 6"') steuerbar verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 11/00; B25D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/24 (2006.01); B25D 11/00 (2006.01); B25D 11/12 (2006.01); B25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/00 (2013.01); B25D 17/043 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01); B25D 2211/068 (2013.01); B25D 2250/221 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319477 A1 20030618; EP 1319477 B1 20100414; CN 1298471 C 20070207; CN 1424166 A 20030618; DE 10160864 A1 20030626; DE 50214358 D1 20100527; JP 2003191178 A 20030708; US 2003116333 A1 20030626; US 6799643 B2 20041005

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110117

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214358 P 20100527

2010-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2010-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090605

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOENI, HANS

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOULKIDIS, ORESTIS

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOENI, HANS

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOULKIDIS, ORESTIS

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO