Global Patent Index - EP 1319481 A2

EP 1319481 A2 2003-06-18 - Cutting machine for bread and similar edible products

Title (en)

Cutting machine for bread and similar edible products

Title (de)

Maschine zum Schneiden von Brot und vergleichbaren Nahrungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe pour pain et produits alimentaires similaires

Publication

EP 1319481 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027232 A

Priority

  • DE 20120234 U
  • DE 20212853 U

Abstract (en)

The cutting machine (10) can slice the food into a large number of slices of uniform thickness. It has an outer housing (14) which stands on rollers (12) for mobility, and contains a frame (16) which can pivot about an axis (18). <??>The movable frame can pivot through 45 degrees from a top position (16a) to a bottom position at a slight angle to the horizontal. There is a cutting table with a cutting groove and the cutting knife consists of an endless band passing round rollers.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine (10.4) zum Schneiden von Brot (62), Fleisch, Wurst, Käse und dergleichen Nahrungsmittel mittels eines Schneidmittels in beliebig dicke Scheiben besitzt einen Schneidtisch zum Auflagern des Nahrungsmittels, wobei am Schneidtisch eine Schneidnut oder ein Schneidschlitz (189) vorhanden ist zum Eintauchen des in Querrichtung vollständig durch das Nahrungsmittel hindurch bewegbaren Schneidmittels. Eine Vorschubeinrichtung ist vorhanden zum - in jeweils gleicher Richtung - synchronen, taktweisen Verschieben der Schneidnut oder des Schneidschlitzes (189) sowie des Schneidmittels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26; B26D 1/46; B26D 7/06; B26D 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/46 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/46 (2013.01); B26D 7/0625 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26D 2007/327 (2013.01); B26D 2210/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319481 A2 20030618; EP 1319481 A3 20050105; EP 1319481 B1 20070815; AT 369947 T 20070915; DE 50210691 D1 20070927

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070815

2008-04-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070815

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210691 P 20070927

2007-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2007-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2005-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2005-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 7/26 A

2005-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 1/46 B

2005-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 7/06 B

2005-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 7/20 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO