Global Patent Index - EP 1319486 A2

EP 1319486 A2 2003-06-18 - Press loading device for manufacturing ceramic tiles, press comprising said device and respective loading method

Title (en)

Press loading device for manufacturing ceramic tiles, press comprising said device and respective loading method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Füllen der Pressformen zur Herstellung von keramischen Fliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le remplissage des moules d'une presse pour la fabrication de carreaux en céramique

Publication

EP 1319486 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425766 A

Priority

IT FI20010236 A

Abstract (en)

The device comprises a reciprocatingly (f3) moving trolley (3) for taking powders from a main feeding hopper (17) and transferring the powders to at least one die-matrix of a press (5). The trolley presents at least one loading grid (11B) which is filled with said powders and transfers said powders to said at least one matrix. The device also comprises at least one auxiliary hopper (31) arranged downstream to the main feeding hopper with respect to the direction of advancement of the trolley to the press die. The auxiliary hopper is equipped with a distributor member (41) to distribute a controlled amount of at least one colored powder on the bottom of the loading grid (11 B) during the return stroke of the grid from the die to the main feeding hopper. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02; B28B 1/00; B28B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/022 (2013.01); B28B 1/005 (2013.01); B28B 13/023 (2013.01); B28B 17/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319486 A2 20030618; EP 1319486 A3 20040519; IT FI20010236 A1 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090929

2009-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090518

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 13/02 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 17/00 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 1/00 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO