Global Patent Index - EP 1319499 A1

EP 1319499 A1 2003-06-18 - Device for pressing tablets

Title (en)

Device for pressing tablets

Title (de)

Tablettenpressvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le pressage des comprimés

Publication

EP 1319499 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026738 A

Priority

DE 10161572 A

Abstract (en)

The tablet press arrangement comprises a tablet press (10) which incorporates motors and sensors. The press is joined by cables to a process computer (18) for high-speed data transmission, and by wireless links to an operating computer (26). The system comprises sender and receiver units (12, 14, 22, 28, 32) for transmission of data and operating commands.

Abstract (de)

Tablettenpressvorrichtung mit einer Tablettenpresse, einem Steuerrechner, der Motoren der Tablettenpresse ansteuert und regelt, und einem Bedienrechner, der die Ein- und Ausgabe von Daten zur Bedienung der Tablettenpresse zuläßt, wobei die Tablettenpresse mit ihren Motoren und Sensoren über eine Kabelverbindung zur Hochgeschwindigkeitsdatentransfer mit dem Steuerrechner verbunden ist und die Tablettenpresse und der Bedienrechner jeweils mit einer Sende- und Empfangseinheit versehen sind, um über eine kabellose Funkverbindung Daten und Steuerbefehle auszutauschen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/00 (2006.01); B30B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/08 (2013.01); B30B 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319499 A1 20030618; EP 1319499 B1 20080903; EP 1319499 B2 20120118; DE 10161572 A1 20030703; DE 10161572 B4 20040325; DE 50212725 D1 20081016; US 2003118682 A1 20030626; US 6979187 B2 20051227

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50212725

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2012-01-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2012-01-18 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50212725

2011-08-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FETTE COMPACTING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FETTE GMBH, 21493 SCHWARZENBEK, DE

- Document: DE 50212725

- Effective date: 20110621

2009-07-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KORSCH AG

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212725 P 20081016

2008-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2008-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060809

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI