Global Patent Index - EP 1319506 A2

EP 1319506 A2 2003-06-18 - Delivery device of a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Delivery device of a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Ausleger einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sortie d'une machine rotative d'impression pour feuilles

Publication

EP 1319506 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023703 A

Priority

DE 10161269 A

Abstract (en)

The stacker has air outlet apertures (20) between the sheet guide plates (10) and the deflecting device (13), and are connected to the suction side of the air preparation unit in a region spaced away from the dusting device (8). The treated air goes to a sheet (17) through the air outlet apertures. Other apertures are connected to the central suction system.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Ausleger einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine mit einer Zentralabsaugung und einem Kettenfördersystem. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Einrichtung zu schaffen, mit der der Energieeinsatz für die Trocknung reduziert und die Verschmutzung der Aggregate der Druckmaschine und des Auslegers durch Puder vermindert werden kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass zwischen den Bogenleitblechen (10) und der Abschotteinrichtung (13) Luftaustrittsöffnungen (20) vorgesehen sind und die in einem ersten, von der Bestäubungseinrichtung (8) beabstandeten Bereich angeordneten Öffnungen in den Bogenleitblechen (10) und Luftabsaugeinrichtungen (18) mit der Ansaugseite einer Luftaufbereitungseinheit (15) in Verbindung stehen, wobei die von dieser aufbereitete Luft über die Luftaustrittsöffnungen (20) einem Druckbogen (17) zuführbar ist und die in einem sich in der Nähe der Bestäubungseinrichtung (8) erstreckenden zweiten Bereich angeordneten Öffnungen in den Bogenleitblechen (10) und Luftabsaugeinrichtungen (18) mit der Zentralabsaugung verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319506 A2 20030618; EP 1319506 A3 20041013; EP 1319506 B1 20090812; EP 1319506 B2 20111019; DE 10161269 A1 20030626; DE 10161269 B4 20050317; DE 50213760 D1 20090924

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213760

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111023

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111023

2011-12-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50213760

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-10-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-10-19 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50213760

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20100422

2009-09-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213760 P 20090924

2009-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-08-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070605

2005-07-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI