Global Patent Index - EP 1319507 A2

EP 1319507 A2 2003-06-18 - Suction device for removing powder and hot air in a delivery device of a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Suction device for removing powder and hot air in a delivery device of a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Puder- und Warmluftabsaugung im Ausleger einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'aspiration de poudre et d'air chaud dans un dispositif de sortie d'une machine rotative d'impression pour feuilles

Publication

EP 1319507 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023704 A

Priority

DE 10161267 A

Abstract (en)

The suction device is in the stacker. It consists of first and second partitioning devices (12, 13), which extend along the sheet feed path and across the width of the stacker. The first one is above the slack part (3) of the chain, and has a suction aperture (14). The second one is between the conveying part (4) and slack part of the chain and includes a suction device (15.1).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Einrichtung zur Puder- und Warmluftabsaugung, die im Ausleger von Bogenrotationsdruckmaschinen eingesetzt wird. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, die überschüssige Warmluft aus dem Ausleger zu entfernen und die Verschmutzung der Aggregate der Druckmaschine durch Puder zu vermindern. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, dass im Ausleger einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine mit Kettenfördersystem und umlaufenden Greiferwagen 7 zwischen dem Förder- und dem Leertrum 3, 4 der Ketten Einrichtungen zur Bestäubung 9 und/oder Trocknung 11 vorgesehen sind und unterhalb des Fördertrums 4 Bogenleitbleche 10 angeordnet und eine erste und eine zweite Abschotteinrichtung 12, 13 vorgesehen sind, die sich längs des Bogenförderweges erstrecken, wobei die erste Abschotteinrichtung 12 oberhalb des Leertrums 3 angeordnet ist und eine Absaugöffnung 14 aufweist und die zweite Abschotteinrichtung 13 zwischen dem Förder- und dem Leertrum 4, 3 der Ketten angeordnet ist und eine sich quer zum Bogenförderweg erstreckende erste Absaugeinrichtung 15.1 aufnimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06; B41F 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319507 A2 20030618; EP 1319507 A3 20040929; EP 1319507 B1 20100901; DE 10161267 A1 20030703; DE 10161267 B4 20070809; DE 50214624 D1 20101014

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171204

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50214624

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111023

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111023

2011-10-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214624

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214624 P 20101014

2010-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-06-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI