Global Patent Index - EP 1319516 A2

EP 1319516 A2 2003-06-18 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungselement und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et méthode d'impression

Publication

EP 1319516 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02079873 A

Priority

  • US 2122701 A
  • US 2076201 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording element comprising a support having thereon an image-receiving layer comprising non-silicon-containing inorganic oxide particles, the particles having their surfaces treated with a silane coupling agent having a hydrophilic, organic moiety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); B41M 5/529 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319516 A2 20030618; EP 1319516 A3 20060118; EP 1319516 B1 20070822; CN 1424203 A 20030618; DE 60221953 D1 20071004; DE 60221953 T2 20080521; JP 2003191634 A 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60221953

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60221953 P 20071004

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060814

2006-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI