Global Patent Index - EP 1319518 A2

EP 1319518 A2 2003-06-18 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungselement und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement au jet d'encre et procédé d'impression

Publication

EP 1319518 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02079971 A

Priority

  • US 2074801 A
  • US 2175701 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording element and printing method having a support having thereon in order: (I) a base layer of at least 50% by weight of inorganic particles; and (II) an image-receiving layer of: (a) colloidal, inorganic oxide particles having a mean particle size of from 10 to 500 nm; and (b) water-insoluble, cationic, polymeric particles having a benzyldimethyl benzylammonium moiety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/502 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5245 (2013.01); B41M 2205/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319518 A2 20030618; EP 1319518 A3 20041215; EP 1319518 B1 20070117; DE 60217630 D1 20070308; DE 60217630 T2 20071025; JP 2003211837 A 20030730

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60217630

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121128

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60217630 P 20070308

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI