Global Patent Index - EP 1319523 A2

EP 1319523 A2 2003-06-18 - Removable board-shaped writing and drawing underlay

Title (en)

Removable board-shaped writing and drawing underlay

Title (de)

Mobile brettartige Schreib- und Zeichenunterlage

Title (fr)

Support amovible en forme de planche pour écrire et peindre

Publication

EP 1319523 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023920 A

Priority

DE 10161865 A

Abstract (en)

The board (55) has a groove (40) for drawing implements and a paper clamp (14) in which a housing (16) carries batteries (18) for a light source (62) operated by a switch (28). The light source may be tungsten, fluorescent or LEDs.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine mobile brettartige Schreib- und Zeichenunterlage (10) mit einer Papierklemmeinrichtung (14) beschrieben. Um die Schreib- und Zeichenunterlage (10) autark und von Tageslicht oder von künstlichem Licht eines Raumes, oder Büros unabhängig benutzen zu können, weist die Papierklemmeinrichtung (14) eine zwischen einer Lagerposition und einer von der Papierklemmeinrichtung (14) wegstehenden aktiven Leuchtposition hin und her verstellbare Lichtquelle (30), ein Aufnahmeabteil (16) für mindestens eine Batterie (18) und einen Schalter (28) auf, die miteinander zusammengeschaltet sind. Die Lichtquelle (30) kann von einem Kaltkathodenröhrchen (46) oder von einer an einem flexiblen länglichen Element (62) angeordneten LED (56) gebildet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 3/00; B42D 5/00; B42F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 9/00 (2006.01); B43L 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 9/004 (2013.01); B43L 3/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319523 A2 20030618; EP 1319523 A3 20060809; DE 10161865 A1 20030710; DE 10161865 B4 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-01-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070210

2007-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI