Global Patent Index - EP 1319560 A2

EP 1319560 A2 2003-06-18 - Motor vehicle with a safety device for pedestrians

Title (en)

Motor vehicle with a safety device for pedestrians

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Sicherheitseinrichtung für Fussgänger

Title (fr)

Véhicule automobile comportant un système de sécurité pour piétons

Publication

EP 1319560 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027372 A

Priority

DE 10161873 A

Abstract (en)

The car has sensors (9) at the front which detect a potential impact with a pedestrian (24). They then trigger the inflation of air bags (4) which cover the whole width of the bonnet (23) and stretch far enough up it to prevent the pedestrian's head (27) from striking it. The air bags are mounted inside a front section (8) of the car which swivels down when they inflate.

Abstract (de)

Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, ein Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Sicherheitseinrichtung für Fußgänger zu schaffen, die einen einfachen Aufbau aufweist. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass die vorhandene Anzahl an Gaskissen (3) im aufgeblasenen Zustand zumindest einen vorderen Bereich der Haube (23) so abdeckt, dass sich die vorhandene Anzahl an aufgeblasenen Gaskissen in Fahrzeugquerrichtung y zumindest über die gesamte Breite der Haube und in Fahrzeuglängsrichtung x mindestens soweit erstreckt, dass bei einem Zusammenstoß mit einem Fußgänger (24) oder dgl. ein Kopf (27) des Fußgängers vor einem oberen Ende (26) des Gaskissens auf das Gaskissen trifft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/34; B60R 19/12; B60R 19/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 19/12 (2006.01); B60R 21/34 (2011.01); B60R 21/36 (2011.01); B60R 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/36 (2013.01); B60R 19/12 (2013.01); B60R 19/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4114016 A1 19921105 - HOEHN BERND ROBERT PROF DR ING [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319560 A2 20030618; EP 1319560 A3 20040519; EP 1319560 B1 20060329; DE 10161873 A1 20030710; DE 50206218 D1 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206218

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206218 P 20060518

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO