Global Patent Index - EP 1319601 A2

EP 1319601 A2 2003-06-18 - Method and device for labelling a CD

Title (en)

Method and device for labelling a CD

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Etikettieren einer CD

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'étiquetage d'un CD

Publication

EP 1319601 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027648 A

Priority

  • DE 10161430 A
  • DE 10227230 A

Abstract (en)

Labeling arrangement (11, 12) comprises a support layer on which a sticky label layer is mounted. The label layer has stampings defining the labels (110, 120). Separating stampings (16, 17, 24, 25) in both label and support layer are used for splitting off the individual labels. Alignment stampings (18, 19, 26, 27) in both support and label layer are for alignment of the labels, while segment stampings (21, 29) in the label layer are to simplify separation of the support layer. <??>The invention also relates to a corresponding method and self-adhesive label paper stamped according to the invention.

Abstract (de)

Eine Anordnung (11; 12) weist eine Trägerschicht sowie eine lösbar auf dieser angeordnete Etikettschicht auf, die auf ihrer Unterseite mit einer selbstklebenden Haftschicht versehen ist. Auf der Etikettschicht ist eine die Kontur des Etiketts (110; 120) festlegende Umfangsstanzung (15; 23) vorgesehen. Auf der Etikettschicht sowie auf der Trägerschicht sind jeweils zwei Vereinzelungsstanzungen (16, 17; 24, 25), die jeweils von einem Rand (13) der Etikettschicht zu der Umfangsstanzung (15; 23) verlaufen, sowie wenigstens eine Ausrichtestanzung (18, 19; 26, 27) angeordnet, die von einem Rand (13) der Etikettschicht wenigstens teilweise in Richtung zu der Umfangsstanzung (15; 23) hin verläuft. Auf der Trägerschicht ist eine Segmentierstanzung (21; 29) vorgesehen, die sich wenigstens zwischen den Vereinzelungsstanzungen (16, 17; 24, 25) ersteckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/265 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5715934 A 19980210 - TOBOL GRETCHEN [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319601 A2 20030618; EP 1319601 A3 20031015; EP 1319601 B1 20050803

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-11-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65C 9/26 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 11B 23/40 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO