Global Patent Index - EP 1319604 A2

EP 1319604 A2 2003-06-18 - Interlockable trays

Title (en)

Interlockable trays

Title (de)

Zusammensteckbare Schalen

Title (fr)

Plateaux connectables

Publication

EP 1319604 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02257987 A

Priority

GB 0129440 A

Abstract (en)

A tray (2; 24) is provided which is capable of engagement with at least a second tray (26). Each tray comprises a cavity (4) for the placement of a foodstuff therein and has first and second engagement means (16, 18; 16', 18') provided at spaced apart locations along an edge of the tray to allow mutual engagement of the trays (2; 24, 26). An indent portion (13) is provided along the edge of each tray between the first and second engagement means (16, 18; 16', 18'), such that when the trays are brought into mutual engagement, the first engagement means (16) of the first tray (2; 24) can be provided over and engaged with the second engagement means (18') of the second tray (26), and the first engagement means (16') of the second tray (26) can be provided over and engaged with the second engagement means (18) of the first tray (2; 24). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/14 (2013.01); B65D 21/0206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319604 A2 20030618; EP 1319604 A3 20031217; GB 0129440 D0 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090630

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070829

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040517

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 21/024 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 71/14 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI