Global Patent Index - EP 1319608 A1

EP 1319608 A1 2003-06-18 - Container in particular for box pallet

Title (en)

Container in particular for box pallet

Title (de)

Behälter, insbesondere Paletteninnenbehälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur notamment pour caisse-palette

Publication

EP 1319608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027178 A

Priority

DE 10161416 A

Abstract (en)

The pallet container is fitted with a connector (1) for emptying it which passes through a bore in the wall. A flange (3) is attached to the container wall and an earthing plate (6) is fastened between the two.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Behälter, insbesondere einen Paletteninnenbehälter, mit einer Ablaufarmatur, die an eine Auslassöffnung in der Behälterwand angeschlossen und über einen Flansch (3) mit der Behälterwand verbunden ist, sowie mit einem Leiterelement (6) zur Ableitung elektrischer Ladungen aus dem Behälter. Erfindungsgemäß ist wenigstens ein Teilstück des Leiterelements (6) zwischen dem Flansch (3) und der Behälterwand angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06; B67D 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2006.01); B67D 7/32 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/3236 (2013.01); B65D 77/061 (2013.01); B65D 2213/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319608 A1 20030618; EP 1319608 B1 20070620; DE 10161416 A1 20030618; DE 50210343 D1 20070802; ES 2286194 T3 20071201; US 2003111465 A1 20030619; US 7353967 B2 20080408

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151206

2017-02-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170203

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151205

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151205

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151205

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210343

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210343

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210343

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

2013-04-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GREIF INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAVIPLAST - SERVICOS DE CONSULTORIA, SOCIEDADE UNIPESSOAL LDA., FUNCHAL, PT

- Document: DE 50210343

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-04-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GREIF INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAVIPLAST - SERVICOS DE CONSULTORIA, SOCIEDADE UNIPESSOAL LDA., FUNCHAL, MADEIRA, PT

- Document: DE 50210343

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210343

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR.-ING. W. BERNHARDT DR. R. BE, DE

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210343

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210343

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

- Effective date: 20130220

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GREIF INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., NL

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-09-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120830 AND 20120905

2012-09-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GREIF INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V.

- Effective date: 20120910

2011-11-17 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50210343

- Effective date: 20110510

2011-09-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20110510

2011-05-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROTECHNA S.A.

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-04-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PROTECHNA S.A.

- Effective date: 20080319

2007-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2286194 T3

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210343 P 20070802

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAVIPLAST - SERVICOS DE CONSULTORIA, SOCIEDADE UNI

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO