Global Patent Index - EP 1319618 A2

EP 1319618 A2 2003-06-18 - Device for transporting single sheets coming from a printer or the like

Title (en)

Device for transporting single sheets coming from a printer or the like

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Transport einzelner aus einem Drucker oder dgl. kommenden Blätter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transporter des feuilles séparées venant d'une imprimante ou similaire

Publication

EP 1319618 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02021321 A

Priority

DE 20118724 U

Abstract (en)

The sheets are guided in a chute, and a drive controlled based on the cut edge is used to pick up the sheets and move them via the chute to an outlet. To access and convey the sheets, rocker arms (3) are provided on both sides, parallel to the edges of the chute, and moved in a pendulum-like way by a drive (13). The free ends of the arms are provided with gripping devices (14,15) for picking up the edges of the sheets.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Einrichtung zum Transport einzelner, aus einem Drucker (4a) oder dgl. kommenden Einzelblätter (5) oder Formularsätze in eine Ablage (8). Zum freien Auslauf der Blätter (5) hinter dem Drucker (4a) oder Schneidgerät (6) und zum Transport der von einem Endlosband abgetrennten Blätter (5), werden zwischen einem Schneidgerät (6) und einer Ablage (8) ein kreisbogenförmiger Schacht (3) und pedelartig angetriebene Schwingen (11) benutzt, die an den freien Enden mit Klemmrollen (14,15) versehen sind. Die Klemmrollen (14,15) erfassen die Blattränder seitlich und bewegen damit die Blätter (5) in einer Pendelbewegung durch den Schacht (3) zu einer Ablage (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/14 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6552 (2013.01); B65H 29/14 (2013.01); B65H 2301/33214 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3422 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1421 (2013.01); B65H 2404/6111 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20118724 U1 20030327; EP 1319618 A2 20030618; EP 1319618 A3 20040825

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-06-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI