Global Patent Index - EP 1319620 A2

EP 1319620 A2 2003-06-18 - Folding apparatus in a rotary printing machine with a folding cylinder having a cam drive

Title (en)

Folding apparatus in a rotary printing machine with a folding cylinder having a cam drive

Title (de)

Falzapparat einer Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine mit einem Falzzylinder mit Kurvengetriebe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage dans une rotative d'impression avec un cylindre de pliage avec une commande à came

Publication

EP 1319620 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027384 A

Priority

DE 10161400 A

Abstract (en)

The cam mechanism for the folding cylinder in a web-fed rotary printing machine has convex sections (14, 15) on the outer surface of the cam roller. These fit on the edges of cam disks (8, 9) and the depression (16) between them is positioned over the gap between the disks.

Abstract (de)

Um an einem Falzzylinder ein Kurvengetriebe mit zwei nebeneinanderliegenden Scheiben (8, 9) einer Kurvenscheibe (10) zu schaffen, das gute kinematische Eigenschaften hat und geringem Verschleiß unterworfen ist, weist der Außenmantel der Kurvenrolle (7) in Umfangsrichtung umlaufend nebeneinander angeordnet zwei konvexe Wölbungen (14, 15) auf, wobei jede Wölbung (14, 15) mit einer Scheibe (8, 9) zusammenarbeitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/163 (2013.01); B65H 45/165 (2013.01); B65H 2403/51 (2013.01); B65H 2403/512 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2101 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319620 A2 20030618; EP 1319620 A3 20040616; EP 1319620 B1 20070411; DE 10161400 A1 20030618; DE 50209908 D1 20070524; US 2003110966 A1 20030619; US 6971280 B2 20051206

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20171019

2017-09-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, DE

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131209

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50209908

- Effective date: 20120626

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209908 P 20070524

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FOLDING APPARATUS IN A ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE WITH A FOLDING CYLINDER HAVING A CAM DRIVE

2005-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO