Global Patent Index - EP 1319623 A1

EP 1319623 A1 2003-06-18 - Method and device for knotting a thread on a bobbin

Title (en)

Method and device for knotting a thread on a bobbin

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Knoten eines Fadens an einer Spule

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de nouage d'un fil sur une bobine

Publication

EP 1319623 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02360337 A

Priority

FR 0116253 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists of taking the end (3) of the yarn and inserting it under tension in the extension of the last wound coil. A slack loop is made parallel to the end of the yarn and twisted together with the yarn. The twist is fastened to the bobbin (1) and the remaining end of the yarn is trimmed off. <??>The pick-up unit (5) for the free end (3) of the yarn is preferably in the form of a suction nozzle (9) with an inner permeable retaining member in the form of a fine grille or foam, a detector cell, and a movable positioning plate (10). The loop is made by a deployable element (11) with rods (12).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé et un dispositif de nouage d'un fil sur une bobine. Procédé caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste essentiellement à saisir l'extrémité (3) du fil et à positionner ledit fil sous tension dans le prolongement de la dernière spire bobinée, à réaliser une boucle lâche parallèlement à l'extrémité (3) du fil tendu, puis à former un tortillon par tordage d'un brin de la boucle lâche avec l'extrémité (3) du fil tendu, à serrer ensuite le tortillon obtenu sur la bobine (1) et à couper l'extrémité restante du fil. L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine de l'industrie textile, en particulier du bobinage de fils et notamment du nouage d'une extrémité de fil sur une bobine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/005 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319623 A1 20030618; EP 1319623 B1 20050727; DE 60205202 D1 20050901; DE 60205202 T2 20060601; FR 2833587 A1 20030620; FR 2833587 B1 20040213

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131206

2015-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131206

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60205202

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60205202

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUPERBA (SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE)

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121207

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205202 P 20050901

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT TR

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT TR

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUPERBA (SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE)

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO