Global Patent Index - EP 1319624 A1

EP 1319624 A1 2003-06-18 - Device and method for modernising an elevator system

Title (en)

Device and method for modernising an elevator system

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Modernisierung einer Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la modernisation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1319624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027363 A

Priority

  • EP 02027363 A
  • EP 01811233 A

Abstract (en)

The floor levels (21) have call units (31) with input panels (32) and identification panels (33) which are transmitted to the computer (30) which signals an arrangement (36) to operate a suitable lift (11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und ein Computerprogrammprodukt zur Modernisierung einer Aufzugsanlage (1), welche Aufzugsanlage (1) mindestens einen Aufzug (10, 10') und mindestens eine Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14') zum Steuern des Aufzugs (10, 10') über mindestens eine Rufineldung aufweist. Die Aufzugsanlage (1) wird im Rahmen von Vorbereitungsarbeiten zur Modernisierung der Aufzugsanlage (1) mit einer Zielrufsteuerung (3) aufgerüstet. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) umfasst mindestens ein Stockwerkterminal (31, 31', 31") zum Eingeben von Zielrufmeldungen bzw. zum Erkennen von Identifikations-Codes von Benutzern. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) umfasst mindestens eine Recheneinheit (30) zum Auswerten der Zielrufmeldungen bzw. zum Zuordnen von Zielstockwerken zu erkannten Identifikations-Codes. Die Recheneinheit (30) gibt mindestens ein Zielsignal aus. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) steuert die Aufzugsanlage (1) über mindestens eine Vorrichtung (36, 36') an. Die Vorrichtung (36, 36') liest das Zielsignal, wandelt es in mindestens eine Rufineldung und steuert mit der Rufmeldung eine bestehende Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14'). Auf diese Weise wird die zu modernisierende Aufzugsanlage (1) mit einer Zielrufsteuerung (3) aufgerüstet und die bestehende Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14') wird weiterhin mit einer Rufmeldung betrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/34 (2006.01); B66B 1/18 (2006.01); B66B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/18 (2013.01); B66B 19/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319624 A1 20030618; EP 1319624 B1 20080213; AR 037858 A1 20041209; AT 385985 T 20080315; AU 2002318767 B2 20070329; BR 0205317 A 20040720; BR 0205317 B1 20140311; CA 2414120 A1 20030617; CA 2414120 C 20110329; CN 1214965 C 20050817; CN 1426953 A 20030702; DE 50211663 D1 20080327; DK 1319624 T3 20080609; ES 2301599 T3 20080701; HK 1056537 A1 20080627; JP 2003201076 A 20030715; JP 2011144049 A 20110728; JP 4806155 B2 20111102; JP 5362766 B2 20131211; MX PA02012304 A 20041213; MY 129701 A 20070430; NO 20026033 A 20030618; NO 20026033 D0 20021216; NO 323476 B1 20070521; NZ 522936 A 20030926; PT 1319624 E 20080516; SG 108891 A1 20050228; SI 1319624 T1 20080831; TW 200408601 A 20040601; TW I268906 B 20061221; US 2003121728 A1 20030703; US 6935465 B2 20050830; ZA 200209810 B 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20171205

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20110725

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081207

2009-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080213

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080513

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KONE CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20081113

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2301599 T3

2008-06-27 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056537

2008-06-09 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-05-16 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080505

2008-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211663 P 20080327

2008-03-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2008-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRIEDLI, PAUL, DR.

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO