Global Patent Index - EP 1319625 A1

EP 1319625 A1 2003-06-18 - Apparatus and method for modernising an elevator system

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for modernising an elevator system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Modernisierung einer Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la modernisation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1319625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027364 A

Priority

  • EP 02027364 A
  • EP 01811234 A

Abstract (en)

The device (36,36') has at least one computer unit (30) that outputs at least one control signal to the device, which converts it into a call message and drives the elevator controller (14,14') using the call message. At least one output of the device is connected to at least one input of at least one electrical floor call sender line (16,16') or at least one cabin call sender line (18,18') of the elevator controller. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a system for modernizing an elevator system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein System zur Modernisierung einer Aufzugsanlage (1), welche Aufzugsanlage (1) mindestens einen Aufzug (10, 10') und mindestens eine Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14') zum Steuern des Aufzugs (10, 10') über mindestens eine Rufmeldung aufweist. Die Aufzugsanlage (1) wird im Rahmen von Vorbereitungsarbeiten zur Modernisierung der Aufzugsanlage (1) mit einer Zielrufsteuerung (3) aufgerüstet. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) umfasst mindestens ein Stockwerkterminal (31, 31', 31") zum Eingeben von Zielrufmeldungen bzw. zum Erkennen von Identifikations-Codes von Benutzern. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) umfasst mindestens eine Recheneinheit (30) zum Auswerten der Zielrufmeldungen bzw. zum Zuordnen von Zielstockwerken zu erkannten Identifikations-Codes. Die Recheneinheit (30) gibt mindestens ein Zielsignal aus. Die Zielrufsteuerung (3) steuert die Aufzugsanlage (1) über mindestens eine Vorrichtung (36, 36') an. Die Vorrichtung (36, 36') liest das Zielsignal, wandelt es in mindestens eine Rufmeldung und steuert mit der Rufmeldung eine bestehende Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14'). Auf diese Weise wird die zu modernisierende Aufzugsanlage (1) mit einer Zielrufsteuerung (3) aufgerüstet und die bestehende Aufzugssteuerung (14, 14') wird weiterhin mit einer Rufmeldung betrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/14 (2006.01); B66B 1/18 (2006.01); B66B 1/34 (2006.01); B66B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/18 (2013.01); B66B 19/007 (2013.01); Y10S 187/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2003116384 A1 20030626; US 6892861 B2 20050517; AR 037859 A1 20041209; AT 301610 T 20050815; AU 2002318768 B2 20070329; BR 0205406 A 20040720; BR 0205406 B1 20131126; CA 2414527 A1 20030617; CA 2414527 C 20110222; CN 1214964 C 20050817; CN 1426952 A 20030702; DE 50203871 D1 20050915; EP 1319625 A1 20030618; EP 1319625 B1 20050810; ES 2247255 T3 20060301; HK 1056538 A1 20051230; JP 2003182952 A 20030703; JP 4786118 B2 20111005; MX PA02012392 A 20041213; MY 131909 A 20070928; NO 20026034 A 20030618; NO 20026034 D0 20021216; NO 322817 B1 20061211; NZ 522935 A 20030429; SG 114592 A1 20050928; TW 200408600 A 20040601; TW I250964 B 20060311; ZA 200209812 B 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247255 T3

2006-01-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-30 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056538

2005-12-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-11-10 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203871 P 20050915

2005-09-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-10 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO