Global Patent Index - EP 1319626 A1

EP 1319626 A1 2003-06-18 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM AND METHOD OF INSPECTING THE ELEVATOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

ELEVATOR SYSTEM AND METHOD OF INSPECTING THE ELEVATOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUFZUGSSYSTEM UND INSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

ELEVATEUR ET METHODE D'INSPECTION DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1319626 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00961120 A

Priority

JP 0006421 W

Abstract (en)

The elevator system of the present invention provides an elevator system comprising a hoist 3 at an upper portion of a hoistway 1, and in which a car 2 provided in the hoistway 1 is raised and lowered by means of the hoist 3 via a rope 3a, wherein, stopping means 7, 8 which is operated during maintenance inspection of the hoist 3 is provided for stopping the car 2 at a predetermined location, and the predetermined location is a location where a roof top of the car is a predetermined amount lower than an upper frame of a landing 10 entrance of a highest floor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/00; B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/005 (2013.01); B66B 5/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319626 A1 20030618; EP 1319626 A4 20060607; EP 1319626 B1 20081008; DE 60040489 D1 20081120; JP 4661022 B2 20110330; JP WO2002024565 A1 20040129; WO 0224565 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60040489

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090709

2008-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040489 P 20081120

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIKAWA, MASAMI,MITSUBISHI DENKI K. K.

2008-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKIGAWA, YUKIHIRO,MITSUBISHI DENKI K. K.

2006-06-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI NL

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE