Global Patent Index - EP 1319627 A1

EP 1319627 A1 2003-06-18 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1319627 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00957123 A

Priority

JP 0006230 W

Abstract (en)

In an elevator apparatus, first and second main rope connection portions are disposed on a car so as to be positioned on opposite sides of the car in a vertical plane of projection. First and second car return sheaves are disposed in an upper portion inside a hoistway above the first and second main rope connection portions. A counterweight return sheave is disposed in an upper portion inside the hoistway above a counterweight. A main rope group has: a first main rope, a first end portion of which passes through the first car return sheave and is connected to the first main rope connection portion and a second end portion of which passes through the counterweight return sheave and is connected to the counterweight; and a second main rope, a first end portion of which passes through the second car return sheave and is connected to the second main rope connection portion and a second end portion of which passes through the counterweight return sheave and is connected to the counterweight. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/00; B66B 7/06; B66B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319627 A1 20030618; EP 1319627 A4 20080903; EP 1319627 B1 20091209; CN 1178844 C 20041208; CN 1387491 A 20021225; DE 60043516 D1 20100121; EP 2042462 A1 20090401; EP 2042462 B1 20110518; JP WO2002022486 A1 20040122; WO 0222486 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180828

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60043516

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130401

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Free text: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#7-3, MARUNOUCHI 2-CHOME#CHIYODA-KU TOKYO 100-8310 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#7-3, MARUNOUCHI 2-CHOME#CHIYODA-KU TOKYO 100-8310 (JP)

2010-03-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-01-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60043516 P 20100121

2009-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2009-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2008-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-09-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080806

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020507

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI