Global Patent Index - EP 1319702 A1

EP 1319702 A1 2003-06-18 - AQUEOUS LUBRICANT FOR PLASTIC WORKING OF METALLIC MATERIAL AND METHOD OF LUBRICANT FILM PROCESSING

Title (en)

AQUEOUS LUBRICANT FOR PLASTIC WORKING OF METALLIC MATERIAL AND METHOD OF LUBRICANT FILM PROCESSING

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGER SCHMIERSTOFF ZUR PLASTISCHEN VERARBEITUNG METALLISCHER WERKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHMIERMITTELFILMS

Title (fr)

LUBRIFIANT AQUEUX POUR LE TRAVAIL PLASTIQUE D'UN MATERIAU METALLIQUE ET PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UN FILM LUBRIFIANT

Publication

EP 1319702 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01925970 A

Priority

  • JP 0103639 W
  • JP 2000237968 A

Abstract (en)

An aqueous lubricant used for plastic working of metallic material which comprises (A) a water soluble inorganic salt, (B) lubricative agent selected from molybdenum disulfide and graphite and (C) wax, wherein the components are dissolved or dispersed in water, and wherein a concentration ratio (weight ratio) of (B) /(A) is in the range of 1.0 SIMILAR 5.0 and (C) / (A) is 0.1 SIMILAR 1. 0. And a method of lubricative film processing on a metallic material, in that the lubricative film formed by applying the aqueous lubricant is in a dried weight of 0.5 SIMILAR 40g/m<2>. A water soluble inorganic salt (A) is preferably selected from the group consisting of a sulfate, a silicate, a borate, a molybdete and a tungstate. The wax (C) is preferably a natural wax or a synthetic wax which is dispersed in water and has a melting point of 70 SIMILAR 150 DEG C. The aqueous lubricant can be used for imparting excellent lubricity with ease to the surface of a metal having no chemical conversion layer formed thereon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 111/00; C10M 173/00; B21C 9/02; B21C 9/00; B21J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 9/00 (2006.01); B21C 9/02 (2006.01); B21J 3/00 (2006.01); C10M 111/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); B21C 9/005 (2013.01); B21C 9/02 (2013.01); B21J 3/00 (2013.01); C10M 111/00 (2013.01); C10M 125/02 (2013.01); C10M 125/10 (2013.01); C10M 125/22 (2013.01); C10M 125/26 (2013.01); C10M 159/06 (2013.01); C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/041 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0413 (2013.01); C10M 2201/042 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2201/065 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0663 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0803 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0873 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1023 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2205/143 (2013.01); C10M 2205/16 (2013.01); C10M 2205/163 (2013.01); C10M 2205/17 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01); C10N 2250/121 (2013.01); C10N 2270/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319702 A1 20030618; EP 1319702 A4 20040811; EP 1319702 B1 20161109; CA 2418942 A1 20030207; CA 2418942 C 20100914; CN 1214095 C 20050810; CN 1468294 A 20040114; JP 3984158 B2 20071003; KR 100621693 B1 20060908; KR 20030027002 A 20030403; MX PA03000789 A 20041101; US 2003130137 A1 20030710; WO 0212419 A1 20020214

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170810

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60150196

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60150196

2016-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2016-06-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051115

2004-08-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 111/00 A

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 173/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21C 9/02 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21C 9/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21J 3/00 B

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 173/00 J

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 125:02 J

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 125:26 J

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 143:02 J

2004-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10N 40:24 Z

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI