Global Patent Index - EP 1319705 A1

EP 1319705 A1 2003-06-18 - Bleach activator cogranulates

Title (en)

Bleach activator cogranulates

Title (de)

Bleichaktivator-Co-Granulate

Title (fr)

Cogranules d'activateur de blanchiment

Publication

EP 1319705 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027051 A

Priority

DE 10161766 A

Abstract (en)

A bleach activator co-granulate of at least one ammonium nitrile and at least one further bleach activator, is obtained by spraying an aqueous solution of one or more ammonium nitriles onto the bleach activator, granulating the resultant mixture and drying and sieving the moist granulate.

Abstract (de)

Bleichaktivator-Co-Granulate aus einem oder mehreren Ammoniumnitrilen und mindestens einem weiteren Bleichaktivator, dadurch erhalten, dass man auf den weiteren Bleichaktivator eine wässrige Lösung eines oder mehrerer Ammoniumnitrile aufsprüht, die erhaltene Mischung granuliert und das feuchte Granulat trocknet und siebt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 1/04 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 7/08 (2006.01); C11D 7/10 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3935 (2013.01); C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 3/3925 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319705 A1 20030618; EP 1319705 B1 20070613; DE 10161766 A1 20030626; DE 50210307 D1 20070726; ES 2287216 T3 20071216; JP 2003193093 A 20030709; US 2003144166 A1 20030731; US 2006252664 A1 20061109; US 7332464 B2 20080219

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2011-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2287216 T3

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210307 P 20070726

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO