Global Patent Index - EP 1319728 A1

EP 1319728 A1 2003-06-18 - Slide fasteners using a copper alloy having excellent continuous castability

Title (en)

Slide fasteners using a copper alloy having excellent continuous castability

Title (de)

Reissverschlüsse aus Kupferlegierung mit ausgezeichneter Stranggiessen-Vergiessbarkeit

Title (fr)

Fermetures à glissière en alliage de cuivre présentant une excellente coulabilité en continu

Publication

EP 1319728 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02024279 A

Priority

JP 2001381142 A

Abstract (en)

The object of the present invention is to provide a copper alloy for slide fasteners which has excellent whiteness, does not contain nickel and hence does not have the problem of nickel allergy, and has excellent continuous castability and casting quality. The composition of the alloy for slide fasteners is represented by the general formula CuaZnbMnc, wherein regarding a, b and c, in mass%, 10 ≤ b ≤ 20, 8 ≤ c ≤ 15, and a is a remainder, with unavoidable impurities being contained. Moreover, the structure of the alloy is preferably made to be a single alpha phase at room temperature, and the surface of the alloy is plated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 9/04; A44B 19/26; C22C 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); C22C 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/00 (2013.01); C22C 9/04 (2013.01); C22C 9/05 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2598 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319728 A1 20030618; EP 1319728 B1 20071219; DE 60224159 D1 20080131; DE 60224159 T2 20081204; ES 2296866 T3 20080501; JP 2003183750 A 20030703; JP 3713233 B2 20051109; US 2003110601 A1 20030619

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080922

2008-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296866 T3

2008-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224159 P 20080131

2007-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-12-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SLIDE FASTENERS USING A COPPER ALLOY HAVING EXCELLENT CONTINUOUS CASTABILITY

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI