Global Patent Index - EP 1319729 A1

EP 1319729 A1 2003-06-18 - High temperature resistant part, made of single-crystal or polycrystalline nickel-base superalloy

Title (en)

High temperature resistant part, made of single-crystal or polycrystalline nickel-base superalloy

Title (de)

Hochtemperaturbeständiges Bauteil aus einkristalliner oder polykristalliner Nickel-Basis-Superlegierung

Title (fr)

Pièce résistante à des températures élevées réalisé en superalliage polycristallin ou monocristallin à base de nickel

Publication

EP 1319729 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01129743 A

Priority

EP 01129743 A

Abstract (en)

Component made from a nickel-based super alloy contains (in wt.%) 9-11 chromium (Cr),3-5 tungsten (W), 0.5-2.5 molybdenum (Mo), 3-3.5 aluminium (Al), 3-5 titanium (Ti), 3-7 tantalum (Ta), 0-12 cobalt (Co), 0-1 niobium (Nb), 0-2 hafnium (Hf), 0-1 zirconium (Zr), 0-0.05 boron (B), 0-0.2 carbon (C), 1-5 rhenium (Re), 0.1-5 ruthenium (Ru), balance nickel (Ni) and impurities. <??>Preferably the alloy contains at least 2 wt.% Re and a maximum of 3 wt.% Ru. The component is a monocrystalline structure having an isotropic distribution of the orientation of the grain structure.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein hochtemperaturbeständiges Bauteil (1) aus einer Nickel-Basis-Superlegierung in folgender Zusammensetzung in Gewichtsprozent: 9-11 % Cr, 3-5 % W, 0,5-2,5 % Mo, 3-5 % Al, 3-5 % Ti, 3-7 % Ta, 1-5 % Re, Rest Nickel. Die Erfindung betrifft auch ein entsprechendes Bauteil (1) mit einer Legierungszusammensetzung entsprechend der oben angegebenen Zusammensetzung bis auf ein Ersetzen des Rheniumanteils mit 0,1-5 Gew.-% Ruthenium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 19/05; C30B 29/52; F01D 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/03 (2006.01); C22C 19/05 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/057 (2013.01); C22C 19/056 (2013.01); F01D 5/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319729 A1 20030618; EP 1319729 A8 20031015; EP 1319729 B1 20070411; CA 2414019 A1 20030613; DE 50112339 D1 20070524; JP 2003193161 A 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121213

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121213

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50112339

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112339 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUERGEL, RALF, PROF.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ESSER, WINFRIED, DR.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROSSMANN, JOERN, DR.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HERMANN, WOLFGANG, DR.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUGHRABI, HAEL, PROF.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PREUHS, JUERGEN

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PYCZAK, FLORIAN

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHOLZ, ALFRED, DR.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SINGER, ROBERT, PROF.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOLEK, ANDREAS

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI