Global Patent Index - EP 1319731 A1

EP 1319731 A1 2003-06-18 - Fireproof steel for a steel construction and process for manufacturing warm rolled hollow profiles, supports, a shape steel or a plate made thereof

Title (en)

Fireproof steel for a steel construction and process for manufacturing warm rolled hollow profiles, supports, a shape steel or a plate made thereof

Title (de)

Feuerresistenter Stahl für den Stahlbau und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Warmgewalzten Hohlprofilen, Trägern, Formstahl oder Grobblech daraus

Title (fr)

Acier réfractaire pour une construction en acier et procédé pour la fabrication par laminage à chaud de profilés creux, de supports, decformes en acier et de tôles fortes

Publication

EP 1319731 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090400 A

Priority

  • DE 10164567 A
  • DE 10258114 A

Abstract (en)

Fire-resistant welding steel in the form of hollow profiles, supports or molded steel contains (in wt.%) 0.06-0.13 C, 0.15-0.50 Si, 1.0-2.0 Mn, maximum 0.025 P, maximum 0.02 S, 0.005-0.040 Al, 0.20-0.40 Mo, 0.40-0.70 W, 0.02-0.05 Nb and a balance of Fe with unavoidable impurities. A component made from the steel has a yield point at elevated temperature of at least 200 MPa at 600 degrees C and a CEIIW value of less than 0.5. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of hot-rolled hollow profiles having a thickness of up to 30 mm made from the above steel comprising casting the steel into strands, hot rolling into rods and then into hollow profiles at at least 1200 degrees C before cooling in air.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen feuerresistenten schweißbaren Stahl, insbesondere in Form von warmgewalzten Hohlprofilen, Trägern, Formstahl oder Grobblech für den Stahlbau mit folgender chemischer Zusammensetzung (in Masse-%): 0,06 - 0,13 % C, 0,15 - 0,50 % Si, 1,0 - 2,0 % Mn, max. 0,025 % P, max. 0,02 % S, 0,005 - 0,040 % Al, 0,20 - 0,40 % Mo, 0,40 - 0,70 % W, 0,02 - 0,05 % Nb Rest Eisen mit erschmelzungsbedingten Verunreinigungen, wobei das aus diesem Stahl hergestellte Bauteil eine Warmstreckgrenze bei 600 °C von mindestens 200 MPa und einen CEIIW-Wert < 0,5 aufweist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hohlprofilen und von Trägern oder Formstahl aus diesem Stahl.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/12; C21D 1/18; C21D 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 8/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/12 (2006.01); C21D 8/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/00 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C21D 8/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YD] EP 0347156 A2 19891220 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
  • [Y] EDUARD HOUDREMONT: "Handbuch der Sonderstahlkunde", 1956, SPRINGER- VERLAG, BERLIN, XP002229746
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 205 (C - 1051) 22 April 1993 (1993-04-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 647 (C - 1283) 8 December 1994 (1994-12-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 342 (C - 0966) 24 July 1992 (1992-07-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319731 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060212

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO