Global Patent Index - EP 1319737 A1

EP 1319737 A1 2003-06-18 - Manufacturing method for differential denier and differential cross section fiber and fabric

Title (en)

Manufacturing method for differential denier and differential cross section fiber and fabric

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fasern und Geweben mit unterschiedlichem Denier und unterschiedlicher Querschnittsform

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de fibres et de tissu de denier et section différentiels

Publication

EP 1319737 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01129250 A

Priority

EP 01129250 A

Abstract (en)

A manufacturing method for differential denier and differential cross section fiber and fabric is provided, wherein the method comprising melting two polymers having different alkali dissolution rate respectively, blending the two polymers in an adjusted ratio, then spinning the blend from a pack assembly consisting of distributor for producing general split type microfiber and spinnerette with spinning orifice of different shape to produce fiber, which is directly formed into SDY (spin draw yarn) subjecting to a direct spin-draw process, or formed into a flat yarn and draw texture yarn subjecting to draw twisting process and false twisting process or formed into a composite flat yarn and composite draw texture yarn subjecting to composite draw twisting process and composite false twist process; spinning said SDY, flat yarn, draw texture yarn, composite flat yarn or composite draw texture yarn to fabric and subjecting the fabric to alkali treatment to obtain fabric with differential denier and differential cross section fabric in excellent tactility and luster. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/30 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2013.01); D01D 5/30 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 01 31 January 2000 (2000-01-31)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 10 31 August 1999 (1999-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319737 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI