Global Patent Index - EP 1319741 A1

EP 1319741 A1 2003-06-18 - Textile material

Title (en)

Textile material

Title (de)

Textiles Material

Title (fr)

Matériau textile

Publication

EP 1319741 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02258379 A

Priority

GB 0128933 A

Abstract (en)

A material 10 with a bobbinet weave. The material 10 has a plurality of nylon warp threads 12 and two sets of bobbin threads 14, 16 provided at two respective inclinations. The bobbin threads 14, 16 are formed of silver coated nylon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04C 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319741 A1 20030618; GB 0128933 D0 20020123; GB 2382822 A 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071023

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070611

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO