Global Patent Index - EP 1319742 A1

EP 1319742 A1 2003-06-18 - Method and arrangement for discharging dirty water from the working zone of a washing machine

Title (en)

Method and arrangement for discharging dirty water from the working zone of a washing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen verschmutzten Wassers aus dem Arbeitsbereich einer Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Système et méthode pour éloigner l'eau sale de la zone de travail d'une machine à laver

Publication

EP 1319742 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024726 A

Priority

DE 10160894 A

Abstract (en)

The residual wash liquor (1) following an emptying process can contaminate the fresh rinse water (4) but the drain pump (3) is operated after a little fresh water has been delivered to the wash drum (2) to clear the dirty water.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Entfernen verschmutzten Wassers (1) aus dem Arbeitsbereich (2) einer Waschmaschine, insbesondere einer Haushaltswaschmaschine. Um eine Vermischung verschmutzten Wassers mit Frischwasser zu vermeiden, sieht das Verfahren die Schritte vor: a) Betätigen einer Entleerungspumpe (3) zum Abpumpen des verschmutzten Wassers (1) aus dem Arbeitsbereich (2) der Waschmaschine; b) Anschließendes Zuführen einer vorgegebenen Menge Frischwasser (4) in den Arbeitsbereich (2) der Waschmaschine; c) Weiteres Betätigen der Entleerungspumpe (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/083 (2013.01); D06F 2204/084 (2013.01); D06F 2204/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319742 A1 20030618; EP 1319742 B1 20050126; DE 10160894 A1 20030717; ES 2234973 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171106

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-02-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120116

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234973 T3

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202103 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI