Global Patent Index - EP 1319744 A2

EP 1319744 A2 2003-06-18 - Method and device for measuring and regulating the nip pressure in the press of a papermaking machine

Title (en)

Method and device for measuring and regulating the nip pressure in the press of a papermaking machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung und Regelung des Nipdrucks in der Presse einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de mesure et de réglage de pression de serrage dans la presse d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 1319744 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027242 A

Priority

AT 19692001 A

Abstract (en)

To control the pressure on a moving paper web through the press section of a papermaking machine, where the web passes between press rollers to extract water and especially a shoe press, the pressure on the web is measured at the press nip across and/or along the direction of web movement. The hydraulic static pressure is measured in the press nip through measurement drillings at the edges of the web and across it, and continuously brought into alignment through comparison with nominal values.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Messung und Regelung des Nipdrucks in der Presse einer Papiermaschine, insbesondere in einer Schuhpresse, quer und/oder längs zur Bahnlaufrichtung. Sie ist vornehmlich dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass der hydraulisch statische Druck an Referenzpunkten über Messbohrungen im Pressnip gemessen und laufend angepasst wird. Weiters betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/06 (2006.01); D21F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/06 (2013.01); D21F 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

AT 410452 B 20030526; AT A19692001 A 20020915; BR 0205407 A 20040720; EP 1319744 A2 20030618; EP 1319744 A3 20040107; MX PA02012536 A 20030625; US 2003127211 A1 20030710; US 6835283 B2 20041228

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090701

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060727

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21F 3/02 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21F 3/06 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO