Global Patent Index - EP 1319745 A1

EP 1319745 A1 2003-06-18 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 1319745 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025319 A

Priority

DE 10161056 A

Abstract (en)

A wire section comprises a twin wire former(s) including a revolving continuous inside wire (14) and a revolving continuous outer wire (12); and an additional strip element(s) (32, 34). <??>A wire section comprises a twin wire former(s) including a revolving continuous inside wire and a revolving continuous outer wire that each include a loop and converge in the area of a first forming element (26); and an additional strip element(s) located after the first forming element, viewed in direction of web travel, inside the loop of the outer wire, and inside the loop of the inner wire.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Siebpartie einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, mit wenigstens einem Doppelsiebformer (10), der ein umlaufendes endloses Innensieb (14) und ein umlaufendes endloses Außensieb (12) umfasst, die im Bereich eines ersten Formierelements (16) in Form einer Formierwalze zusammenlaufen, wobei in Sieblaufrichtung nach dem ersten Formierelement (16) sowohl innerhalb der Schlaufe des Außensiebes (12) als auch innerhalb der Schlaufe des Innensiebes (14) zusätzlich jeweils wenigstens ein Leistenelement (32, 34) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319745 A1 20030618; DE 10161056 A1 20030626; US 2003106662 A1 20030612; US 7008511 B2 20060307

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051126

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI