Global Patent Index - EP 1319748 A1

EP 1319748 A1 2003-06-18 - Multiply sheet of absorbent paper

Title (en)

Multiply sheet of absorbent paper

Title (de)

Mehrlagige Bahn eines saugfähigen Papiers

Title (fr)

Feuille multiple de papier absorbant

Publication

EP 1319748 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01403221 A

Priority

EP 01403221 A

Abstract (en)

The multilayer absorbent paper sheet, comprising two layers (12, 14) of cellulose wadding, each with a weight of 15 - 35 g/sq m, has the first layer embossed with a first set of motifs in selected zones (16), made from embossed protuberances (18) projecting towards the second layer (14) and forming open cells in the sheet's outer surface. <??>At least some of the protuberances (18) have their tips (19) attached to the inner surface of the second layer. The first layer of the paper has a second set of motifs made from a series of smaller embossed protuberances (38) of smaller dimensions than the first and having a higher density. The second set of protuberances are set in recesses (36) so that their tips (39) are in contact with the second layer and some are attached to it.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une feuille multiple comprenant un premier pli (12) et un deuxième pli (14) en ouate de cellulose, chacun de grammage compris entre 12 et 35 g/m<2>, le premier pli comportant un premier motif de gaufrage sur des premières zones (16) constitué de premières protubérances (18) en saillie sur la face interne du premier pli correspondant à des alvéoles sur la face externe qui forment notamment des premiers alignements et dont au moins une partie des sommets (19) est liée à la face interne du deuxième pli (14) en vis-à-vis. Cette feuille est caractérisée par le fait que ledit premier pli (12) comporte un deuxième motif de gaufrage constitué de deuxièmes protubérances (38) en saillie sur la face interne du premier pli dont la hauteur par rapport aux premières protubérances est plus faible, dont la densité est plus élevée, et dont au moins une partie des sommets est dans le même plan que les sommets des premières protubérances et est liée à la face interne du deuxième pli. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/40; B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/40 (2013.01); B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0764 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0766 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319748 A1 20030618; EP 1319748 B1 20080430; EP 1319748 B2 20101201; EP 1319748 B9 20111102; AT 393856 T 20080515; CA 2468208 A1 20030619; CA 2468208 C 20100824; DE 60133828 D1 20080612; DE 60133828 T2 20090520; DE 60133828 T3 20110622; DK 1319748 T3 20080901; DK 1319748 T4 20110307; ES 2305043 T3 20081101; ES 2305043 T5 20110415; MX PA04005261 A 20050323; NO 20033551 A 20031013; NO 20033551 D0 20030811; NO 334198 B1 20140113; PT 1319748 E 20080729; US 2005034828 A1 20050217; US 7413630 B2 20080819; WO 03050353 A2 20030619; WO 03050353 A3 20080103

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180831

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080430

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161212

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161212

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161212

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161212

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60133828

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20110400492

- Effective date: 20160707

2016-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160613

2016-07-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-06-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160613

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2012-03-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE, BOIS-COLOMBES, FR

- Document: DE 60133828

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60133828

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60133828

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60133828

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-04-15 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2305043 T5

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-04-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110400492

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-04-12 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-04-12 [REG SE NAV] PATENT APPLICATION HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-07 [REG DK T4] AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2011-03-02 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-12-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080430

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2009-03-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20090130

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2305043 T3

2008-09-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401931

2008-09-01 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60133828 P 20080612

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-04-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI