Global Patent Index - EP 1319750 A2

EP 1319750 A2 2003-06-18 - Track lining with covering panels

Title (en)

Track lining with covering panels

Title (de)

Gleisauskleidung mit Abdeckplatten

Title (fr)

Revêtement de voie ferrée avec des panneaux de recouvrement

Publication

EP 1319750 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02016365 A

Priority

DE 10160628 A

Abstract (en)

The cladding for a railway track (2) has plates (7) at the sides and between the rails (4), laid on the sleepers (3), where the rails are secured to the sleepers by holders (5). The plates are locked together by bolts (10), parallel to the rails, with at least one recess at the rail mountings. The locking bolts are of a non-conductive plastics material, inserted into drillings at the covering plates. Intermediate plastics sections (9), with a width of 1 cm, ensure a correct fit of the plates at the sleepers. The covering plates are of concrete, stone or a mixture of cement and wood fibers.

Abstract (de)

Eine Gleisauskleidung zur beidseitigen Abdeckung des an Schienen (4) einer Gleisanlage (2) angrenzenden Gleiskörpers sowie des Gleiskörpers zwischen den Schienen (4) umfaßt Abdeckplatten (7), die auf Schwellen (3) aufgelegt sind, wobei die Schienen (4) mit Schienenhalterungen (5) an den Schwellen (3) befestigt sind. Die Abdeckplatten (7) sind mittels im wesentlichen parallel zu den Schienen (4) angeordneten Verbindungsbolzen (10) miteinander verbunden und weisen im Bereich der Schienenhalterungen (5) zumindest eine Aussparung (14) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00; E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3818952 A1 19890503 - BRAUN WILHELM [DE], et al

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319750 A2 20030618; EP 1319750 A3 20040512; DE 10160628 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041115

2005-03-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01B 1/00 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01B 19/00 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI