Global Patent Index - EP 1319751 A2

EP 1319751 A2 2003-06-18 - Working vehicle and method for operating without driver

Title (en)

Working vehicle and method for operating without driver

Title (de)

Arbeitsfahrzeug und Verfahren zum führerlosen Betrieb

Title (fr)

Véhicule utilitaire et méthode pour fonctionner sans commande

Publication

EP 1319751 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450254 A

Priority

AT 9372001 U

Abstract (en)

The vehicle (1) has the distance measurement system (12) in front of the cabin directed forwards across the track. An obstruction (18) on the track reflects a laser beam which is detected and at a predetermined distance from it the braking system is applied.

Abstract (de)

An einer Stirnseite (11) eines gleisverfahrbaren Arbeitsfahrzeuges (1) ist ein berührungslos wirksames Distanzmeßgerät (12) mit einer - bezüglich einer durch ein Gleis (3) gebildeten Gleisebene (15) - einen Neigungswinkel (α) einschließenden Tastebene (14) angeordnet. Damit wird eine durch Gleis- und Tastebene (15,14) gebildete, quer zur Gleislängsrichtung verlaufende Tastlinie (16) gebildet. Sobald durch ein Hindernis (18) ein Mindestabstand x unterschritten wird, erfolgt automatisch eine Abbremsung und ein Stillstand des Fahrzeuges (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 35/00; B61L 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/04 (2006.01); E01B 35/00 (2006.01); G01S 13/93 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319751 A2 20030618; EP 1319751 A3 20040428; EP 1319751 B1 20060222; AT 5086 U2 20020325; AT 5086 U3 20030225; CN 1283487 C 20061108; CN 1425577 A 20030625; DE 50205871 D1 20060427; ES 2256439 T3 20060716; RU 2240942 C2 20041127

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 50205871

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50205871

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50205871

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-06-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060523

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-09-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256439 T3

2006-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-22 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205871 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01B 35/00 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 61L 23/06 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI