Global Patent Index - EP 1319757 A2

EP 1319757 A2 2003-06-18 - Installing guardrail barrier posts

Title (en)

Installing guardrail barrier posts

Title (de)

Einbringen von Pfosten für Leitplankensysteme

Title (fr)

Montage de poteaux de barrière routière

Publication

EP 1319757 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027492 A

Priority

DE 10161651 A

Abstract (en)

The system to mount the posts for roadside curb boards uses a vehicle to carry the posts with a mechanism to fit them in position. Initially the vehicle (1) is positioned approximately at the post site, and a post is secured vertically in a holder directly where the post is to be planted. The post is transferred to a mounting unit (2) which is positioned accurately at the site by a measurement system, where it is driven into the ground by a ram hammer (7) or the like. The position for the post is established by satellite navigation measurements and/or image recognition and/or conventional manual measurements.

Abstract (de)

Zunächst eine Grobpositionierung des Fahrzeuges (1) in Bezug auf die Einbringstelle des Pfostens (4), dass wenigstens ein Pfosten (4), der in vertikaler Position in einer Haltevorrichtung (3) fixiert ist, in den unmittelbaren Einbringbereich des Pfostens (4) in den Boden befördert wird, dass der Pfosten (4) der Haltevorrichtung (3) entnommen und von einer Einbringeinrichtung (2) übernommen wird, dass er in eine jeweils messtechnisch ermittelte Sollposition über dem Boden gebracht wird, dass das Einbringen des Pfostens (4) in den Boden geführt erfolgt und dass die Vorgänge automatisch und zumindest teilweise bildschirmüberwacht und/oder computergesteuert ausgeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/0484 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1130169 A1 20010905 - LODEWIJK PETRUS MARIA MINCK [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319757 A2 20030618; EP 1319757 A3 20040331; DE 10161651 A1 20030703; DE 10161651 B4 20070712

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080317

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070810

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI