Global Patent Index - EP 1319766 A1

EP 1319766 A1 2003-06-18 - Connection device and set of two such devices for profiles with an omega cross-section

Title (en)

Connection device and set of two such devices for profiles with an omega cross-section

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung und Satz zweier solcher Vorrichtungen für Profile mit einem Omega-Querschnitt

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison et ensemble de deux tels dispositifs pour profilés à section en oméga

Publication

EP 1319766 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292952 A

Priority

FR 0116221 A

Abstract (en)

The omega shaped section has a median part and two lateral webs. The median part has a central trapezoidal channel whose sloping sides are connected to the lateral webs by connection parts. The connection device comprises a connection web (32A) constituted from a plane lateral zone (34A) and an intermediate zone (36A). These two zones make an obtuse angle corresponding to the angle made between the connection part and the sloping edge of the section. The connection web is constituted from two parallel lateral zones (34A,35A) located either side the intermediate zone and intended to cooperate with a connection part and with the base of the section.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de liaison pour profilé (21) à section en oméga présentant une partie médiane et deux ailes latérales (23), laquelle partie médiane présente centralement un canal à section de forme trapézoïdale dont les bords obliques (27) sont reliés aux ailes latérales (23) par des pans de raccordement (26) perpendiculaires au plan des ailes latérales (23), la concavité dudit canal étant dirigée vers l'extérieur : le dispositif de liaison comprend une aile dite de liaison (32,32A) constituée de deux zones planes, une zone latérale (34,34A) et une zone (36,36A) dite intermédiaire, les deux dites zones (34,34A,36,36A) faisant entre elles un angle obtus correspondant à l'angle que font entre eux le pan de raccordement (26) et le bord oblique (27) du profilé (21) ; l'aile de liaison (32,32A) est constituée de deux zones latérales (34,34A,35,35A) parallèles disposées de part et d'autre de la zone intermédiaire (36,36A) et destinées à coopérer avec un pan de raccordement (26) et avec la base (28) du profilé (21), respectivement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/58; E04B 2/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04B 2/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/5818 (2013.01); E04B 2/766 (2013.01); E04B 2001/405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES IT LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319766 A1 20030618; EP 1319766 B1 20080716; ES 2198227 T1 20040201; ES 2198227 T3 20081201; FR 2833683 A1 20030620; FR 2833683 B1 20061201; PT 1319766 E 20081017

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171013

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090417

2008-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198227 T3

2008-10-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20081007

2008-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES IT LU NL PT

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050804

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE ES IT LU NL PT

2004-02-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI