Global Patent Index - EP 1319768 A2

EP 1319768 A2 2003-06-18 - Drainage channel between a wall and a slab cladding

Title (en)

Drainage channel between a wall and a slab cladding

Title (de)

Entwässerungsrinne zwischen einer Wand und einem Plattenbelag

Title (fr)

Caniveau d'écoulement entre une paroi et un revêtement de dalles

Publication

EP 1319768 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023251 A

Priority

DE 20119441 U

Abstract (en)

Drainage device comprises an angle strip (26) having one arm (34) placed under the hard core (20) and another arm (36) enclosing the hard core and the paving (14), a supporting profile (30) attached to a wall (12), and a cover (28) having a spacer protruding from one side and which is laid on a channel (16) formed by the space between the wall and the angle strip. The cover lies on the supporting profile and the paving. The spacer holds the angle strip away from the wall. <??>Preferred Features: The angle strip is permeable to water, especially a perforated metal sheet.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Entwässerungseinrichtung (10) zur Bildung einer Rinne (16) zwischen einer Wand (12) und einem auf einer Schüttung (20) verlegten Plattenbelag (14). Die Erfindung schlägt vor, die Entwässerungseinrichtung (10) mit einer Winkelleiste (26), die eine Einfassung für die Schüttung (20) und den Plattenbelag (14) bildet, einer Abdeckung (28), die die Rinne (16) abdeckt und einem Auflageprofil (30) für die Abdeckung (28), die an einer Wand (12) anbringbar ist, auszubilden. Zusätzlich kann ein in die Rinne (16) einlegbarer Distanzhalter (32) für die Winkelleiste (26) vorgesehen werden. Die Entwässerungseinrichtung (10) hat den Vorteil, dass sie in ihrer Höhe an eine Höhe des Plattenbelags (14) anpassbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/04; E01C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 5/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 5/00 (2013.01); E04D 13/0445 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119441 U1 20020425; EP 1319768 A2 20030618; EP 1319768 A3 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071024

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04D 13/04 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 11/22 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI