Global Patent Index - EP 1319771 A2

EP 1319771 A2 2003-06-18 - Awning, especially an awning with articulated arms

Title (en)

Awning, especially an awning with articulated arms

Title (de)

Markise, insbesondere Gelenkarmmarkise

Title (fr)

Store, notamment store à bras articulés

Publication

EP 1319771 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010896 A

Priority

DE 10160784 A

Abstract (en)

The awning (1) includes an awning cloth (2) which can be wound up into a cloth roll (3), and a front bar (4) arranged at the free outer end of the awning cloth. The front bar has a swivel hinge (7) having an approximately horizontal or forward tilting swivel axis (5).

Abstract (de)

Eine Markise (1), insbesondere Gelenkarmmarkise, umfaßt ein in Form eines Tuchwickels (3) aufwickelbares Markisentuch (2) und ein am freien äußeren Ende des Markisentuchs (2) angeordnetes, mit diesem verbundenes Ausfallprofil (4), wobei das Ausfallprofil wenigstens ein Schwenkgelenk (7) mit einer annähernd horizontalen bzw. nach vorne geneigten Schwenkachse (5) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/04 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0611 (2013.01); E04F 10/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319771 A2 20030618; EP 1319771 A3 20041208; EP 1319771 B1 20080109; AT 383479 T 20080115; CN 1203240 C 20050525; CN 1424475 A 20030618; DE 10160784 A1 20030618; DE 50211513 D1 20080221; DK 1319771 T3 20080526; ES 2298306 T3 20080516; JP 2003184248 A 20030703; JP 4362280 B2 20091111; PT 1319771 E 20080317; US 2003106649 A1 20030612; US 6820673 B2 20041123

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180508

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180503

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180406

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080516

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-26 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2298306 T3

2008-04-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400640

2008-03-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080305

2008-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211513 P 20080221

2008-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080122

2008-02-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-02-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-01-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI