Global Patent Index - EP 1319780 A1

EP 1319780 A1 2003-06-18 - Lock with a motorized drawing device for a door or lid

Title (en)

Lock with a motorized drawing device for a door or lid

Title (de)

Schloss mit einer motorischen Zuzieheinrichtung an einer Tür oder Klappe

Title (fr)

Serrure avec un dispositif motorisé pour attirer une porte ou couvercle

Publication

EP 1319780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024964 A

Priority

DE 10155307 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for a vehicle door or bonnet etc has a rotary catch (1) with coupling ratchet (6) and a motorised adjustable coupling support with coupling lever (4) and coupling nose. During motorised adjustment of the coupling support when the catch is moved up to its closing position or an intermediate position in front of the closing position the coupling nose (5) of the lever (4) engages with force in the coupling ratchet of the catch. In the event of resistance through a body part or similar, the nose automatically disengages from the ratchet to release the jammed object.

Abstract (de)

Schloss mit einer motorischen Zuzieheinrichtung an einer Tür oder Klappe, mit einer Drehfalle (1), an der eine Raste (15, 21) ausgebildet ist, vor die in einer Schließlage der Drehfalle (1) eine Sperrklinke (14) eingreift, die von einer Löseeinrichtung von der Raste (15, 21) weg verstellbar ist. An einem motorisch verstellbaren Kupplungsträger (8) ist ein Kupplungshebel (4) verstellbar angeordnet, der eine Kupplungsnase (5) aufweist, die von einem Federelement zu einer Kupplungsraste (6) an der Drehfalle (1) belastet ist. Die Kupplungsnase (5) ist über die Löseeinrichtung oder eine weitere Löseeinrichtung von der Kupplungsraste (6) weg verstellbar. Beim motorischen Verstellen des Kupplungsträgers (8), bei dem die Drehfalle (1) an die Schließlage oder an eine Zwischenlage vor der Schließlage angenähert wird, greift die Kupplungsnase (5) des Kupplungshebels (4) kraftschlüssig in die Kupplungsraste (6) der Drehfalle (1) ein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/20 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 10155307 A1 20030522; EP 1319780 A1 20030618; EP 1319780 B1 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202104

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202104 P 20050303

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI