Global Patent Index - EP 1319781 A2

EP 1319781 A2 2003-06-18 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1319781 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027815 A

Priority

DE 20120957 U

Abstract (en)

The car lock comprises a locking lever (10), especially a central lock, together with an operating lever (6), especially an inner operating lever for a catch (2, 4). There is also a child protection system (20, 21, 22). The child protection system works on a steering lever (8) which, in the 'Engaged position', the locking lever can be taken off in relation to the operating lever by triggering the operating lever. In the 'Vacant position', the locking lever is coupled from the movement of the operating lever. The steering lever may be built as a two-armed lever and set on the locking lever's rotation axis. The steering lever may comprise a gripping arm (8a) and a steering arm (8b) that may be, preferably, arranged at an angle to one another. The gripping arm may work together with the operating lever whilst the steering arm may work together with a peg (22) from the child protection system.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss, der mit einem Verriegelungshebel (10), insbesondere Zentralverriegelungshebel (10), einem Betätigungshebel (6), insbesondere Innenbetätigungshebel (6) für ein Gesperre (2, 4) und mit einer Kindersicherungseinrichtung (20, 21, 22) ausgerüstet ist. Erfindungsgemäß arbeitet die Kindersicherungseinrichtung (20, 21, 22) auf einen Steuerhebel (8) der in seiner "Eingreifposition" in Bezug zum Betätigungshebel (6) den Verriegelungshebel (10) bei Auslösung des Betätigungshebels (6) mitnimmt und in seiner "Leerposition" den Verriegelungshebel (10) von Bewegungen des Betätigungshebels (6) abkoppelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/26 (2014.01); E05B 81/16 (2014.01); E05B 77/30 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/265 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/30 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120957 U1 20020502; DE 50209582 D1 20070412; EP 1319781 A2 20030618; EP 1319781 A3 20040204; EP 1319781 B1 20070228

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209582 P 20070412

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-02-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050420

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI