Global Patent Index - EP 1319782 A1

EP 1319782 A1 2003-06-18 - Drawer locking mechanism

Title (en)

Drawer locking mechanism

Title (de)

Verriegelungseinrichtung einer Schublade

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage d'un tiroir

Publication

EP 1319782 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02027776 A

Priority

GB 0130069 A

Abstract (en)

A drawer locking mechanism comprises a slide assembly (16) slidably mounted in a slot (14) provided in a guide member adapted to be secured to an inside face of a piece of furniture, such as a filing cabinet. The slide assembly comprises first, second and third slide members (20, 22, 24) for each drawer, and at an upper part of the guide member, a stop (26). The three slide members are separable within the guide member (10), and are urged into engagement by a spring (30) acting downwardly against the stop (26). Each of the first slide members (20) has fixedly secured thereto an abutment member (32) and each second slide member (22) has pivotally mounted thereon an actuating member (40), comprising a laterally extending arm (42). On opening movement of a drawer (6), a locking pin (50) projecting from the side face of the drawer engages the arm (42) urging the actuating member (40) in an anti-clockwise direction, causing the abutment member (32) to lift, until engaged with cam surfaces of the actuating member. In this raised position of the abutment member, opening movement of a further drawer is prevented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/464 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319782 A1 20030618; GB 0130069 D0 20020206; GB 0228850 D0 20030115; GB 2383076 A8 20030618; GB 2383076 A8 20030630; GB 2383076 A 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO