Global Patent Index - EP 1319786 A1

EP 1319786 A1 2003-06-18 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 1319786 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023164 A

Priority

DE 20120613 U

Abstract (en)

Hinge has frame hinge part for fixing to a fixed frame and a leaf hinge part for fixing to a leaf of the window, door, etc. Leaf hinge part has a rail (30) for fixing to the leaf. Slide block (40) is positioned in the rail so that moves along the longitudinal direction of the leaf bar. Counter-bearing (38) is supported on the slide block. Slide block and the counter-bearing have wedge surfaces (52, 54) facing each other. <??>Preferred Features: The slide block is driven by a screw (42) fixed to the rail and extending in the longitudinal direction of the leaf bar.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Scharnier für ein Fenster, eine Tür oder dergl., mit einem an einem Festrahmen (16) zu befestigenden Rahmenbandteil (14) und einem am Flügel (12) des Fensters, der Tür oder dergl. zu befestigenden Flügelbandteil (18), wobei das Flügelbandteil (18) eine am Flügel (12) zu befestigende Schiene (30) aufweist, an der Schiene (30) ein Schlitten (40) in Längsrichtung des Flügelholms (26) verfahrbar gelagert ist und am Schlitten (40) sich ein Gegenlager (38) abstützt, wobei der Schlitten (40) und das Gegenlager (38) einander zugewandte Keilflächen (52, 54) aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05D 7/0415 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120613 U1 20020404; EP 1319786 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090505

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070920

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI