Global Patent Index - EP 1319789 A1

EP 1319789 A1 2003-06-18 - Drive for sliding door wings

Title (en)

Drive for sliding door wings

Title (de)

Antrieb für einen Schiebetürflügel

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour panneaux coulissants

Publication

EP 1319789 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026732 A

Priority

DE 10160915 A

Abstract (en)

The door-leaf is supported and guided by at least one runner-roller (27) along a rail (25) along which it is moved by means of a drive motor. The drive motor and at least one runner-roller are contained in a running carriage (28) joined to the door leaf. The drive motor is connected to a cog wheel (35) rotating on a vertical pivot axle (36) and cooperating with a row of teeth along the rail. For power transmission from the cog wheel to the row of teeth, contact points (40,41) are vertical for load application of the runner-roller onto the rail.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Antrieb (20) für einen Schiebetürflügel, insbesondere für Schiebestapelwände, Nachtverschlüsse, Rundschiebetüren, Personenschleusen und dergleichen. Der Türflügel stützt sich über wenigstens eine Laufrolle (27) auf einer Schiene (25) geführt ab. Der Türflügel ist mittels eines Antriebsmotors entlang der Schiene (25) bewegbar, wobei der Antriebsmotor und wenigstens eine Laufrolle (27) in einem fest mit dem Türflügel verbundenen Laufwerk (28) aufgenommen sind, so daß der Antriebsmotor (26), das Laufwerk (28) und der Türflügel gemeinsam entlang der Schiene (25) verschiebbar sind. Der Antriebsmotor ist mit einem um eine vertikale Drehachse drehbaren Zahnrad (35) wirkverbunden, das mit einer sich entlang der Schiene (25) erstreckenden Zahnreihe (38) zusammenwirkt. Das Laufwerk (28) weist nur eine einzige Laufrolle (27) auf. Zur Kraftübertragung von dem Zahnrad (35) auf die Zahnreihe (37) dienende Berührstellen (40) und einem Lastangriff der Laufrolle (27) auf der Schiene (25) zugeordnete Berührstellen (41) sind im wesentlichen lotrecht übereinander angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/14; E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05F 15/638 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0608 (2013.01); E05F 15/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/722 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/726 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319789 A1 20030618; EP 1319789 B1 20050907; AT 304110 T 20050915; DE 10160915 C1 20030618; DE 50204168 D1 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 304110 T

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204168

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204168 P 20051013

2005-10-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI