Global Patent Index - EP 1319794 A1

EP 1319794 A1 2003-06-18 - System for the immobilization of a reinforcement rod into a flexible leaf of a handling rolling door

Title (en)

System for the immobilization of a reinforcement rod into a flexible leaf of a handling rolling door

Title (de)

Immobilisierungssystem von einem Bewehrungsstab in einem flexiblen Torblatt eines Rolltores

Title (fr)

Système d'immobilisation d'un tube de renfort dans un tablier souple d'une porte de manutention

Publication

EP 1319794 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356243 A

Priority

FR 0115832 A

Abstract (en)

The door (1) has a flexible curtain (2) having sheaths (3) which accommodate horizontal reinforcing bars and reinforcing tubes. Each of reinforcing bars and a hauling bar (5) are arranged in each sheath. Hauling straps (8) move the curtain from an open position to a closed position. Strap runners (7) cooperate with reinforcing bars and hauling straps forming a retaining and immobilizing arrangement.

Abstract (fr)

La porte de manutention pour bâtiment industriel comporte un rideau ou tablier souple (2) dans lequel sont retenu(e)s dans des fourreaux (3) parallèles les uns aux autres des barres horizontales de renfort ou tubes de renfort (4) et une barre de traction (5), un arbre moteur entraîné en rotation par un moto réducteur, des sangles de traction (8) pour le déplacement du rideau souple (2) d'une position d'ouverture à une position de fermeture, des passes sangles (7) coopérant avec les barres de renfort (4) et les sangles de traction (8), des montants verticaux solidaires de glissières de guidage, et des moyens de retenue et d'immobilisation des barres horizontales de renfort (4) à l'intérieur des fourreaux (3) au niveau de la liaison desdites barres de renfort (4) avec les passes sangles (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/56; E06B 9/262

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/13 (2006.01); E06B 9/262 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/063 (2013.01); E06B 9/0692 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319794 A1 20030618; EP 1319794 B1 20070912; DE 60222366 D1 20071025; FR 2833296 A1 20030613; FR 2833296 B1 20040702; US 2003106650 A1 20030612; US 6868637 B2 20050322

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MAVIFLEX, FR

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-04-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222366 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI