Global Patent Index - EP 1319796 A1

EP 1319796 A1 2003-06-18 - Climbing aid for ladders

Title (en)

Climbing aid for ladders

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Gewichtsentlastung einer eine Steigleiter begehenden Person

Title (fr)

Dispositif aidant une personne à monter une échelle

Publication

EP 1319796 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025452 A

Priority

DE 10161573 A

Abstract (en)

The weight compensator for a user on a stepladder has a tension cable (16) running between pulleys (11,14) at the top and bottom of the ladder and connected to the users harness. the lower pulley is connected to a reeling drive to compensate for the users weight. The driven tension cable is an endless cable. The cable can have a safety stop clamp.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Gewichtsentlastung einer eine Steigleiter begehenden Person umfassend ein Zugseil, auf das eine Konstantzugwinde mit einer permanenten Zugkraft einwirkt, sowie eine Sicherungseinrichtung, die an einem Gurtsystem der die Steigleiter begehenden Person einerseits und an dem Zugseil andererseits lösbar befestigbar ist, wobei das von der Konstantzugwinde (11) angetriebene Zugseil (16) als Endlosseil ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/12; E06C 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/04 (2006.01); B66B 9/00 (2006.01); E06C 7/12 (2006.01); E06C 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/04 (2013.01); B66B 9/00 (2013.01); E06C 7/12 (2013.01); E06C 7/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319796 A1 20030618; DE 10161573 A1 20030703; DE 10161573 B4 20070516

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030618

- Countries: LT

2004-03-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030618

- Countries: LV

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI