Global Patent Index - EP 1319810 A1

EP 1319810 A1 2003-06-18 - Combustion engine with piston cooling and valve drive lubrication

Title (en)

Combustion engine with piston cooling and valve drive lubrication

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit Kolbenkühlung und Schmierung eines Ventiltriebes

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion avec refroidissement du piston et lubrification du mécanisme de soupapes

Publication

EP 1319810 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027805 A

Priority

DE 10161610 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has the oil injection jets (4) and the lubricating jets (5) built into co-axial first (7) and second (8) borings. The first borings, for the oil injection jets, run from the interior of the crankcase to the oil channel (6). The second borings, to supply the roller tappets (2) with lubricating oil, run from the oil channel to the tappet guides (9).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Kolbenkühlung und Schmierung eines Ventiltriebes. Die Kolben von Brennkraftmaschinen bedürfen einer Kühlung durch Ölspritzdüsen 4. Gleichzeitig müssen die Rollenstößel 2 für die Betätigung der Stößelstangen geschmiert werden. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Doppelfunktion dadurch erfüllt, daß die Ölspritzdüsen 4 und die Schmierdüsen 5 in koaxiale erste und zweite Bohrungen 7, 8 eingebaut sind, wobei erste Bohrungen für den Einbau der Ölspritzdüsen 4 von Innenraum des Kurbelgehäuses ausgehen und im Ölkanal 6 münden und zweite Bohrungen 8 zur Versorgung von Rollenstößeln 2 mit Schmieröl vom Ölkanal 6 ausgehen und in Stößelführungen 9 münden, daß in die ersten Bohrungen 7 die Ölspritzdüsen 4 orientiert eingebaut sind und daß in die zweiten Bohrungen 8 die Schmierdüsen 5 eingebaut sind, welche gleichzeitig der Verdrehsicherung dienen. Die erfindungsgemäße Anordnung der Ölspritzdüsen 4 und der Schmierdüsen 5 erlaubt eine exakte Positionierung der Ölspritzdüsen 4 und eine einfache Montage derselben. Gleichzeitig wird die Schmierung der Rollenstößel 2 sichergestellt und deren Verdrehsicherung gewährleistet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 9/10; F01M 1/08; F01M 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/08 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F01M 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 9/104 (2013.01); F01M 1/08 (2013.01); F01M 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319810 A1 20030618; EP 1319810 B1 20070124; DE 10161610 A1 20030626; DE 50209333 D1 20070315

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG, 80995 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50209333

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-04-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-03-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110304

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209333 P 20070315

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO