Global Patent Index - EP 1319827 A2

EP 1319827 A2 2003-06-18 - Solenoid valve for controlling an injection valve of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Solenoid valve for controlling an injection valve of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Magnetventil zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Electrovanne pour commander une soupape d'injection d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1319827 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026671 A

Priority

DE 10161002 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a valve seat with a conical seat face, an axially movable armature (14) between the valves seat and an electromagnet and an at least partly spherical valve element (13) for opening and closing a fuel outlet channel (10). The armature can move radially in the valve housing (2) without a mechanical guide arrangement and is radially fixed on the armature when the fuel outlet channel is closed.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Magnetventil zur Steuerung eines Einspritzventils (1) einer Brennkraftmaschine, umfassend einen Ventilsitz mit konischer Ventilsitzfläche, einen zwischen Ventilsitz und einem Elektromagneten in einem Ventilgehäuse (2) axial beweglichen Anker (14) und ein mit dem Anker (14) bewegtes und mit dem Ventilsitz (12) zusammenwirkendes, zumindest teilkugelförmiges Ventilglied (13) zum Öffnen und Schließen eines Kraftstoffablaufkanals (10), ist erfindungsgemäß der Anker (14) frei von mechanischen Führungsmitteln in radialer Richtung beweglich im Ventilgehäuse (2) angeordnet und ist zumindest bei verschlossenem Kraftstoffablaufkanal (10) das Ventilglied (13) in radialer Richtung am Anker (14) fixiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0071 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19701879 A1 19980723 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319827 A2 20030618; EP 1319827 A3 20041229; DE 10161002 A1 20030703; JP 2003193939 A 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060429

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI