Global Patent Index - EP 1319829 A1

EP 1319829 A1 2003-06-18 - Fuel feeding system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel feeding system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffzufuhrsystem für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1319829 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02293078 A

Priority

FR 0116045 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel feed for a motor vehicle internal combustion engine has a fuel feed pump for an injection system (22) connected between a fluid reservoir and the injectors. A return circuit (26) for excess fuel to the reservoir extends to a portion of the feed circuit downstream of the pump and the reservoir. The return circuit has a pressure regulator to regulate the pressure in the injectors.

Abstract (fr)

Ce système d'alimentation d'un dispositif en fluide comprend un circuit (14) d'admission de fluide dans le dispositif comprenant une pompe d'alimentation d'un système d'injection (22) raccordée, d'une part, à un réservoir de fluide et, d'autre part, à des moyens (20) d'injection de fluide dans le dispositif, un circuit (26) de retour de fluide en excès vers le réservoir, qui s'étend entre une portion du circuit d'admission située en aval de la pompe et le réservoir, et des moyens (24, 28) de régulation de pression agissant sur le débit de fluide dans le circuit de retour de fluide pour réguler la pression du fluide dans les moyens d'injection. Les moyens de régulation de pression sont disposés dans le circuit de retour de fluide en excès et comportent des moyens de mesure d'une caractéristique représentative du niveau de pression régnant en aval de la pompe, et des moyens de commande (24) pilotant la pompe d'injection (22) en fonction de la valeur de ladite caractéristique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/54; F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02M 69/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/54 (2013.01); F02D 41/3082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319829 A1 20030618; FR 2833307 A1 20030613; FR 2833307 B1 20041015

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070124

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060913

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO