Global Patent Index - EP 1319831 A2

EP 1319831 A2 2003-06-18 - High pressure fuel pump having integrated vane feed pump

Title (en)

High pressure fuel pump having integrated vane feed pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe mit integrierter Sperrflügel-Vorförderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à combustible haute pression avec pompe de gavage à pallettes

Publication

EP 1319831 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027182 A

Priority

DE 10161258 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel pump has at least one pump element (15) driven by a camshaft. A cavity (31) in the pump housing (1), which may be divided into a suction cavity (41) and a pressure cavity (43), forms a blocking vane pre-supply pump together with the cam-shaped sector (5) of the camshaft and a blocking vane, which can act as a pre-supply pump for the pump element.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe vorgeschlagen, bei der das mindestens eine Pumpenelement (13) von einer Nockenwelle (3) angetrieben wird. Ein Innenraum (31) des Pumpengehäuses (1) bildet zusammen mit dem nockenförmigen Abschnitt (5) der Nockenwelle (3) und einem Sperrflügel (37) eine Sperrflügelpumpe, die als Vorförderpumpe für das mindestens eine Pumpenelement (15) dienen kann. Auf diese Weise wird nahezu ohne zusätzlichen Bauaufwand eine Vorförderpumpe in die Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe integriert, was Herstellungskosten und Bauraum einspart. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F02M 39/00; F02M 59/16; F04B 23/10; F04B 49/22; F04C 2/356

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F02M 39/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/12 (2006.01); F02M 59/16 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 23/10 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01); F04C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 39/005 (2013.01); F02M 59/102 (2013.01); F02M 59/46 (2013.01); F02M 63/00 (2013.01); F04B 1/043 (2013.01); F04B 23/103 (2013.01); F04B 49/225 (2013.01); F04C 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0481964 B1 19950517 - NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319831 A2 20030618; EP 1319831 A3 20031203; EP 1319831 B1 20090930; DE 10161258 A1 20030703; DE 50213881 D1 20091112; JP 2003222063 A 20030808; US 2004105761 A1 20040603; US 6807951 B2 20041026

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213881

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213881

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091230

2009-11-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213881 P 20091112

2009-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-09-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040603

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO