Global Patent Index - EP 1319837 A1

EP 1319837 A1 2003-06-18 - Gerotor pump

Title (en)

Gerotor pump

Title (de)

Gerotorpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe de type gerotor

Publication

EP 1319837 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01870276 A

Priority

EP 01870276 A

Abstract (en)

The volumetric interior gearing gerotor pump comprises an interior pinion mounted on a rotating shaft and meshing with an exterior crown wheel (5) with interior teeth. The rotating crown wheel has a cylindrical contact surface with a fixed guide ring. The crown wheel and/or the guide ring have several bearing grooves (10) distributed over the whole contact surface in the guide zone.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention se rapporte à une pompe volumétrique rotative à engrenage intérieur du type dit à gerotor, à alimentation axiale ou radiale, comprenant un pignon intérieur (4) monté sur un arbre (A) entraîné en rotation et coopérant avec une couronne extérieure (5) à denture intérieure (3), ladite couronne (5) en rotation ayant une surface de contact cylindrique (11) avec une bague de guidage (8) fixe, caractérisée en ce que la couronne (5) et/ou la bague de guidage (8) présente(nt) une pluralité de rainures (10) de portances réparties sur toute la surface de contact (11) au niveau de la zone de guidage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10; F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/102 (2013.01); F04C 15/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0736691 A1 19961009 - TECHSPACE AERO SOC [BE]

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5104303 A 19920414 - MORI SANAE [JP], et al
  • [A] BE 552057 A
  • [A] FR 1554858 A 19690124
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 069 (M - 286) 31 March 1984 (1984-03-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 14 22 December 1999 (1999-12-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 10 17 November 2000 (2000-11-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319837 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI